Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB92 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte, Uresti S.B. No. 92
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 26, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 92 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a program to provide a ballot by
 electronic mail to military personnel serving overseas and their
 spouses and dependents residing overseas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 101, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 101.0072 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.0072.  ELECTRONIC MAIL BALLOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The
 secretary of state shall implement a program to allow the use of
 electronic mail to provide balloting materials for a general
 election for state and county officers to an overseas voter who is:
 (1)  a member of the armed forces of the United States;
 or
 (2)  a spouse or dependent of a member of the armed
 forces of the United States.
 (b)  A county with a population of 100,000 or more shall
 participate in the electronic mail ballot program.  A county with a
 population of less than 100,000 may participate in the program only
 if:
 (1)  the early voting clerk of the county makes a
 request to the secretary of state to participate; and
 (2) the secretary of state approves the request.
 (c)  The early voting clerk in a county participating in the
 program shall send balloting materials to an electronic mail
 address in a form and manner prescribed by the secretary of state if
 the voter:
 (1)  is an FPCA registrant and is eligible for early
 voting by mail under Sections 101.001(1) and (2)(A);
 (2)  provides a current address that is located outside
 the United States;
 (3)  provides an electronic mail address that contains
 the voter's name and the suffix ".mil" or provides an electronic
 copy of a letter from the commanding officer of the member of the
 armed forces that indicates that the voter is a spouse or dependent
 of the member and is residing overseas; and
 (4)  requests that balloting materials be sent by
 electronic mail.
 (d)  Balloting materials sent to an electronic mail address
 under Subsection (c) shall include a signature sheet for the voter.
 The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures to allow for the
 signature sheet to be signed by a voter using a digital signature.
 (e)  If the early voting clerk provides a ballot to a voter at
 an electronic mail address under Subsection (c), the clerk must
 provide ballots to all voters who qualify under that subsection.
 (f)  If the early voting clerk provides a ballot to a voter at
 an electronic mail address under Subsection (c), the clerk shall
 amend the voter's federal postcard application for future elections
 with the voter's current address.
 (g)  A ballot sent to an electronic mail address under
 Subsection (c) must be returned with the signature sheet by the
 method provided by:
 (1) Section 101.008; or
 (2)  Section 105.001, regardless of whether the voter
 would qualify under that section.
 (h)  An electronic mail address provided under this section
 is confidential and does not constitute public information for
 purposes of Chapter 552, Government Code.  The early voting clerk
 shall ensure that an electronic mail address provided under this
 section is excluded from disclosure.
 (i)  If a voter returns both a voted ballot mailed to the
 voter under Section 101.007(a) and a voted ballot provided
 electronically to the voter under this section, only the ballot
 that was provided electronically may be counted.  A ballot returned
 under this chapter shall be processed in the same manner as any
 other ballot voted by mail as provided by Chapter 87.
 (j)  All other provisions of this code that would normally
 apply to a ballot voted under this chapter apply to a ballot voted
 under this section, including the deadline provided by Section
 86.007 and electronic transmission of a ballot under Section
 105.001.
 (k)  The secretary of state may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 (l)  Nothing in this section may be construed to impose
 liability with respect to the electronic mail ballot program
 created under this section on:
 (1) an Internet service provider;
 (2)  an interactive computer service, as defined by 47
 U.S.C. Section 230;
 (3)  a telecommunications service, as defined by 47
 U.S.C. Section 153; or
 (4)  a cable operator, as defined by 47 U.S.C. Section
 522.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *