Senate | 04/27/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |