Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB920 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Harris S.B. No. 920
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 920 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right to an expunction of records and files relating
 to a person's arrest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Article 55.01, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person who has been placed under a custodial or
 noncustodial arrest for commission of either a felony or
 misdemeanor is entitled to have all records and files relating to
 the arrest expunged if:
 (1) the person is tried for the offense for which the
 person was arrested and is:
 (A) acquitted by the trial court, except as
 provided by Subsection (c) [of this section]; or
 (B) convicted and subsequently pardoned; or
 (2) each of the following conditions exist:
 (A) either:
 (i) an indictment or information charging
 the person with commission of a felony has not been presented
 against the person for an offense arising out of the transaction for
 which the person was arrested and:
 (a)  the applicable limitations period
 expired before the date on which a petition for expunction was filed
 under Article 55.02; or
 (b)  the court finds that there is
 reasonable cause to believe the state will not proceed against the
 person for an offense arising out of the transaction for which the
 person was arrested; or
 (ii) [or,] if an indictment or information
 charging the person with commission of a felony was presented
 against the person for an offense arising out of the transaction for
 which the person was arrested, the indictment or information has
 been dismissed or quashed[,] and:
 (a) [(i)] the applicable limitations
 period expired before the date on which a petition for expunction
 was filed under Article 55.02; [or]
 (b) [(ii)] the court finds that the
 indictment or information was dismissed or quashed because the
 presentment had been made because of mistake, false information, or
 other similar reason indicating absence of probable cause at the
 time of the dismissal to believe the person committed the offense or
 because it was void; or
 (c)  the court finds that there is
 reasonable cause to believe the state will not proceed against the
 person for an offense arising out of the transaction for which the
 person was arrested;
 (B) the person has been released and the charge,
 if any, has not resulted in a final conviction and is no longer
 pending and there was no court ordered community supervision under
 Article 42.12 for any offense other than a Class C misdemeanor; and
 (C) the person has not been convicted of a felony
 in the five years preceding the date of the arrest.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 person seeking expunction of records relating to an arrest
 regardless of whether the arrest occurred before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *