House | 05/05/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1206 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1206 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1070 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 432 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 432 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |