E | 05/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2617 | |
E | 05/07/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2117 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2477 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#560 | Journal Page: 2476 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2476 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2476 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 217 | Journal Page: 2414 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |