House
|
05/23/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 986
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|