E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2893
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1114
|
Journal Page: 4583
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4583
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4583
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 492
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 492
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|