Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Introduced
2/10/09  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 11, 2009, and ending on Tuesday, February 17, 2009.

Impact

The passage of SCR16 would have a direct impact on how the Texas legislature conducts its sessions. It would allow lawmakers to extend their break, thereby providing more time for discussion and negotiation of legislative matters. This flexibility might also facilitate better planning by providing legislators the opportunity to address pending issues without the pressure of a tighter schedule.

Summary

SCR16, a Senate Concurrent Resolution, seeks to grant permission for the Texas legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specified period from February 11, 2009, to February 17, 2009. This request is rooted in Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which typically requires both houses of the legislature to consent to adjourn for periods longer than three days. This resolution is essentially a procedural maneuver allowing the legislature to operate flexibly during the specified timeframe.

Contention

While SCR16 does not appear to spark significant contention based on the available information, it exemplifies the ongoing dialogue about legislative procedures and the need for adaptability within government operations. Ensuring proper legislative function and considering the necessity of extended adjournments reveals the considerations of efficiency and calendar management in the legislative process. Since the resolution relies on constitutional provisions, it underscores the importance of formal legislative procedures.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.