E | 02/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 166 | |
E | 01/27/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 55 | |
House | 01/27/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 71 | |
Senate | 01/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 38 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 55 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 32 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 27 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 27 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 46 | |
Senate | 01/14/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 29 | |
Senate | 01/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |