1 | 1 | | S.C.R. No. 2 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Governor T. M. Campbell signed a bill on March 31, |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1909, for the establishment of a normal college west of the 100th |
---|
7 | 7 | | meridian; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Canyon was selected as the location for the new |
---|
9 | 9 | | normal college on September 3, 1909, and a 40-acre tract was trimmed |
---|
10 | 10 | | from the T-Anchor Ranch on November 4, 1909, as the site for the |
---|
11 | 11 | | college; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, Ground was broken on February 17, 1910, for the |
---|
13 | 13 | | college's first building, and West Texas State Normal College |
---|
14 | 14 | | opened on September 20, 1910, with an enrollment of 232 students; |
---|
15 | 15 | | and |
---|
16 | 16 | | WHEREAS, On March 25, 1914, Old Main, the college's main |
---|
17 | 17 | | facility, burned to the ground, and President R. B. Cousins |
---|
18 | 18 | | declared, "If West Texas is nothing more than brick and mortar, it |
---|
19 | 19 | | ought to die"; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | WHEREAS, On March 26, 1914, classes at West Texas Normal |
---|
21 | 21 | | College were conducted in church buildings, the courthouse, and |
---|
22 | 22 | | vacant businesses across the city of Canyon; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, West Texas Normal College has been known as West |
---|
24 | 24 | | Texas State Teachers College (1923-1949), West Texas State College |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1949-1963), West Texas State University (1963-1990), and West |
---|
26 | 26 | | Texas A&M University (1990 to present); and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University students have brought |
---|
28 | 28 | | recognition to the university and the State of Texas with eight |
---|
29 | 29 | | consecutive team triumphs at the National Reining Horse Association |
---|
30 | 30 | | National Championship, Students in Free Enterprise advancing to the |
---|
31 | 31 | | national level of competition for 13 consecutive years, and |
---|
32 | 32 | | students in broadcasting winning the regional crown for the 11th |
---|
33 | 33 | | consecutive year at the National Broadcasting Society Region 4 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Convention and the 11th consecutive Model Chapter of the Year award |
---|
35 | 35 | | at the National NBS Student Electronic Media Competition; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, The school's symphonic band has appeared 12 times at |
---|
37 | 37 | | the Texas Music Educators Association annual convention, making it |
---|
38 | 38 | | the only university band in the state of Texas to make a record |
---|
39 | 39 | | number of appearances at the annual event; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University's student athletes have |
---|
41 | 41 | | competed successfully in National Collegiate Athletic Association |
---|
42 | 42 | | sports, in which the Lady Buff volleyball team has won three |
---|
43 | 43 | | national championships, the football team is 4-0 in bowl games and |
---|
44 | 44 | | has won four Lone Star Conference championships, and the Buff and |
---|
45 | 45 | | Lady Buff basketball teams are on track to defend their 2007 Lone |
---|
46 | 46 | | Star Conference titles; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has been instrumental in |
---|
48 | 48 | | the region's economic, social, and cultural development over the |
---|
49 | 49 | | past 100 years, with 50 percent of the working professionals living |
---|
50 | 50 | | in the Texas Panhandle having earned their degrees from West Texas |
---|
51 | 51 | | A&M University; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has provided educational |
---|
53 | 53 | | opportunities for more than 100,000 individuals over the past 100 |
---|
54 | 54 | | years and has more than 35,000 alumni working and living in the |
---|
55 | 55 | | state of Texas; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has a full roster of |
---|
57 | 57 | | graduates who have taken leadership roles here in the state of Texas |
---|
58 | 58 | | and across the country including State Representative John Smithee, |
---|
59 | 59 | | First Lady of Texas Anita Perry, former AT&T Wireless chief |
---|
60 | 60 | | executive officer Stan Sigman, Mercury Morris of the Miami |
---|
61 | 61 | | Dolphins, former player and head coach of the Philadelphia 76ers |
---|
62 | 62 | | Maurice Cheeks, and Microsoft general manager for premier and |
---|
63 | 63 | | alliance support Joe Austin; now, therefore, be it |
---|
64 | 64 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
65 | 65 | | hereby commemorate the centennial of the establishment of West |
---|
66 | 66 | | Texas A&M University and commend the school's administrators, |
---|
67 | 67 | | faculty, staff, and students on their valuable contributions to the |
---|
68 | 68 | | State of Texas; and, be it further |
---|
69 | 69 | | RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be prepared in honor |
---|
70 | 70 | | of this special occasion. |
---|
71 | 71 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
72 | 72 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
73 | 73 | | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 2 was adopted by the Senate |
---|
74 | 74 | | on January 14, 2009. |
---|
75 | 75 | | ______________________________ |
---|
76 | 76 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
77 | 77 | | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 2 was adopted by the House |
---|
78 | 78 | | on January 15, 2009. |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
81 | 81 | | Approved: |
---|
82 | 82 | | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | 83 | | Date |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Governor |
---|