Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.C.R. No. 2


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Governor T. M. Campbell signed a bill on March 31,
 1909, for the establishment of a normal college west of the 100th
 meridian; and
 WHEREAS, Canyon was selected as the location for the new
 normal college on September 3, 1909, and a 40-acre tract was trimmed
 from the T-Anchor Ranch on November 4, 1909, as the site for the
 college; and
 WHEREAS, Ground was broken on February 17, 1910, for the
 college's first building, and West Texas State Normal College
 opened on September 20, 1910, with an enrollment of 232 students;
 and
 WHEREAS, On March 25, 1914, Old Main, the college's main
 facility, burned to the ground, and President R. B. Cousins
 declared, "If West Texas is nothing more than brick and mortar, it
 ought to die"; and
 WHEREAS, On March 26, 1914, classes at West Texas Normal
 College were conducted in church buildings, the courthouse, and
 vacant businesses across the city of Canyon; and
 WHEREAS, West Texas Normal College has been known as West
 Texas State Teachers College (1923-1949), West Texas State College
 (1949-1963), West Texas State University (1963-1990), and West
 Texas A&M University (1990 to present); and
 WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University students have brought
 recognition to the university and the State of Texas with eight
 consecutive team triumphs at the National Reining Horse Association
 National Championship, Students in Free Enterprise advancing to the
 national level of competition for 13 consecutive years, and
 students in broadcasting winning the regional crown for the 11th
 consecutive year at the National Broadcasting Society Region 4
 Convention and the 11th consecutive Model Chapter of the Year award
 at the National NBS Student Electronic Media Competition; and
 WHEREAS, The school's symphonic band has appeared 12 times at
 the Texas Music Educators Association annual convention, making it
 the only university band in the state of Texas to make a record
 number of appearances at the annual event; and
 WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University's student athletes have
 competed successfully in National Collegiate Athletic Association
 sports, in which the Lady Buff volleyball team has won three
 national championships, the football team is 4-0 in bowl games and
 has won four Lone Star Conference championships, and the Buff and
 Lady Buff basketball teams are on track to defend their 2007 Lone
 Star Conference titles; and
 WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has been instrumental in
 the region's economic, social, and cultural development over the
 past 100 years, with 50 percent of the working professionals living
 in the Texas Panhandle having earned their degrees from West Texas
 A&M University; and
 WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has provided educational
 opportunities for more than 100,000 individuals over the past 100
 years and has more than 35,000 alumni working and living in the
 state of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, West Texas A&M University has a full roster of
 graduates who have taken leadership roles here in the state of Texas
 and across the country including State Representative John Smithee,
 First Lady of Texas Anita Perry, former AT&T Wireless chief
 executive officer Stan Sigman, Mercury Morris of the Miami
 Dolphins, former player and head coach of the Philadelphia 76ers
 Maurice Cheeks and Microsoft general manager for premier and
 alliance support Joe Austin; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the centennial of the establishment of West
 Texas A&M University and commend the school's administrators,
 faculty, staff, and students on their valuable contributions to the
 State of Texas; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be prepared in honor
 of this special occasion.