Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Introduced
2/17/09  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 18, 2009, and ending on Monday, February 23, 2009.

Impact

The passage of SCR20 would temporarily alter the legislative routine, permitting both houses of the Texas Legislature to extend their adjournment beyond the standard limit. This flexibility can be crucial for accommodating unforeseen legislative requirements, extended discussions on complex issues, or delays in negotiations. By passing this resolution, legislators could concentrate on pending legislative matters without being constrained by the usual adjournment rules, thus potentially enhancing legislative productivity.

Summary

SCR20 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution that seeks to grant the Texas Legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during a specific period, from February 18, 2009, to February 23, 2009. The resolution arises from the stipulations within Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which prohibits either house from adjourning for more than three days without mutual consent. This resolution aims to facilitate legislative flexibility during a critical period in the session, allowing lawmakers to manage their time and deliberations more effectively.

Contention

While the bill does not appear to have generated significant public contention, the discussion surrounding legislative adjournments often involves considerations of transparency and accountability. Critics might express concerns about extended adjournments leading to reduced public scrutiny and oversight of legislative activities, particularly when discussions pertain to contentious issues. However, since this resolution is procedural, it is less likely to attract substantial opposition compared to more controversial policy-related bills.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.