House | 03/19/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 416 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |