E | 03/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 439 | |
E | 03/02/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 363 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 330 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 421 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 421 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |