E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 900 | |
E | 03/23/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 647 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 619 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 356 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |