E | 03/03/2009 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 381 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 445 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Record vote | RV#37 | Journal Page: 444 |
House | 02/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 444 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 444 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |