Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32

Introduced
2/24/09  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 25, 2009, and ending on Monday, March 2, 2009.

Impact

This resolution, if adopted, would enable both houses of the Texas Legislature to break from session for a duration exceeding the typical limit. The implications of such an action may enhance the flexibility of legislative processes, allowing time for discussions, negotiations, or regrouping sessions as needed during a legislative period. Furthermore, it signifies a procedural modification in legislative practice in Texas, reflecting a need for adaptability within the legislative calendar.

Summary

SCR32 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution introduced in the Texas Legislature that seeks to grant permission for the legislature to adjourn for more than three days. The constitutional context of SCR32 references Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which stipulates that neither house may adjourn for longer than three days without the consent of the other house. The resolution outlines a specific period for which this extended adjournment is being requested, covering dates from February 25, 2009, to March 2, 2009.

Contention

While SCR32 does not introduce substantive policy changes, it raises questions regarding legislative processes and the balance of power between the two houses of the legislature. The foundational concern addresses whether extended adjournments weaken legislative oversight or disrupt the continuity of lawmaking. Critics of similar resolutions often argue that they could lead to inefficiencies in governance and oversight of essential state operations.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.