Senate | 04/20/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Jackson | Journal Page: 1114 |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Postponed | 4/15/09 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 1010 |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1010 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1010 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1009 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 493 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 493 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |