Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR33 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Jackson S.C.R. No. 33
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4,
 Nays 2; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Betty Bardwell alleges that:
 (1) she was employed by the Rebecca Sealy Hospital,
 part of The University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston;
 (2) on or about May 13, 2003, she slipped on a liquid
 substance on the floor of the employee break room at the Rebecca
 Sealy Hospital;
 (3) as a result of the fall, she sustained injuries to
 her right wrist that required surgery;
 (4) there were no warning signs that indicated
 housekeeping had mopped the floor;
 (5) she reported the incident to David H. McLaren of
 The University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston, and that his
 subsequent report to The University of Texas System Workers'
 Compensation Insurance Company was "totally incorrect";
 (6) David McLaren's report indicated that Betty
 Bardwell knowingly walked on a wet floor despite warning signs;
 (7) her reputation has been damaged as a result of the
 inaccurate report;
 (8) the Texas Workers' Compensation Commission
 conducted a hearing on January 5, 2004, to determine the validity of
 her claims;
 (9) the decision was favorable to Betty Bardwell;
 (10) additionally, Betty Bardwell signed an
 "Authorization for Release of Information" addressed to Dr. Emmie
 Ko, the surgeon who performed the wrist surgery, on which she
 indicated that only medical records related to the injuries
 sustained in the fall should be released;
 (11) during the Texas Workers' Compensation Commission
 hearing, she discovered that Bradley D. McClellan, assistant
 attorney general for the State of Texas, had access to her entire
 medical file;
 (12) The University of Texas Medical Branch at
 Galveston released her entire medical file to Rydman Record
 Retrieval, a company that was contracted by the attorney general's
 office to obtain her medical records;
 (13) the original "Authorization for Release of
 Information" was altered by either the attorney general's office or
 Rydman Record Retrieval, and that Dr. Emmie Ko's name had been
 removed from the request;
 (14) the request as submitted by Rydman Record
 Retrieval was not compliant with the Health Insurance Portability
 and Accountability Act of 1996 (HIPAA);
 (15) Bradley D. McClellan is ultimately responsible
 for the altered release form; and
 (16) Betty Bardwell is entitled to exemplary damages
 in the amount of $500,000; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the Legislature of the State of Texas, That Betty
 Bardwell is granted permission to sue the State of Texas, The
 University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston, and the Office of
 the Attorney General subject to Chapter 107, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the president of The University of Texas
 Medical Branch at Galveston and the attorney general be served
 process as provided by Subdivision (3), Subsection (a), Section
 107.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 * * * * *