House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/24/09 8:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4584
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4584
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 493
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 493
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|