E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5152 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5155 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4983 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6045 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Record vote | RV#1556 | Journal Page: 6044 |
House | 05/31/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6044 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6044 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 4301 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4219 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2606 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2606 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2606 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2606 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |