E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2511 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2400 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2866 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2299 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1873 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |