Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR71 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.C.R. No. 71


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Lone Star State lost a dedicated law enforcement
 officer when Texas game warden George Harold Whatley, Jr., died in
 the line of duty on October 10, 2008, at the age of 45; and
 WHEREAS, A graduate of the 52nd Texas Game Warden Academy in
 2007, Game Warden Whatley was stationed in Van Horn as a member of
 the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department law enforcement division;
 he upheld the highest standards of his profession during his time
 with the agency, and he played an active role in protecting the
 state's environment, wildlife, and natural resources; and
 WHEREAS, George Whatley was born in Atlanta, Texas, on
 September 19, 1963; he graduated from Linden-Kildare High School in
 1982 and went on to earn a degree at The University of Texas at Tyler
 in 1986; an individual of many interests and talents, he worked in a
 variety of occupations, including those of teacher, tree planter,
 construction worker, rancher, and railcar mechanic, before
 beginning his service as a game warden; and
 WHEREAS, In all of his endeavors, he enjoyed the love and
 support of his wife, Kelly, and his sons, Samuel and Seth, and he
 also took great comfort in his spiritual faith; and
 WHEREAS, Known for the professionalism that he exhibited in
 his work, for his profound commitment to upholding the laws of our
 state, and for his devotion to his family and his faith, George
 Whatley will forever be remembered with great admiration and
 affection; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of George Harold Whatley, Jr., and
 extend deepest condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Kelly Mitchell Whatley; to his sons, Samuel Miles Whatley and
 Seth Mitchell Whatley; to his siblings, Michael Whatley and his
 wife, Kandi, Susie Jackson and her husband, Randy, Sandy Whatley,
 and Sharon Crowder and her husband, Ricky; to his mother-in-law,
 Lois Mitchell; to his sister-in-law, Letha Mitchell Cross, and her
 husband, Mike; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Game Warden Whatley.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 71 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 7, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 71 was adopted by the House
 on May 14, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor