E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5152 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5155 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 5109 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6956 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#1740 | Journal Page: 6956 |
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6956 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6955 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 6000 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4352 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2755 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2755 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2755 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2356 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2352 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2352 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2352 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |