Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR72 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.C.R. No. 72
22
33
44 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
55 WHEREAS, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. alleges that:
66 (1) Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. acquired four
77 inactive "orphaned" wellbores in Sherman Field, Offshore Calhoun
88 County, Texas, that are strategically located to enhance the
99 capture of reserves that would otherwise be uneconomical to
1010 recover;
1111 (2) One of these orphaned wellbores is designated
1212 "State Tract 708-S No. 5";
1313 (3) Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. intends to rework
1414 the orphaned wellbores it owns in Sherman Field and tie them back in
1515 to the Sherman pipeline system;
1616 (4) In a conference on May 19, 2008, representatives
1717 from Gulf Energy Exploration Corp., the Railroad Commission of
1818 Texas, the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Texas,
1919 American Coastal Energy, Inc., and bankruptcy counsel for American
2020 Coastal Energy, Inc., reached a tentative settlement and
2121 forbearance agreement, pending approval of the commission,
2222 attorney general, and bankruptcy court;
2323 (5) On or about May 25, 2008, the Railroad Commission
2424 of Texas wrongfully plugged and abandoned State Tract 708-S No. 5,
2525 using Superior Energy Services, Inc., as the plugging contractor;
2626 (6) By June 9, 2008, all parties to the agreement of
2727 May 19, 2008, had signed the settlement and forbearance agreement;
2828 (7) On June 27, 2008, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
2929 paid a deposit of $400,000 and filed Certificates of Compliance and
3030 Transportation Authority with the Railroad Commission of Texas;
3131 (8) On June 30, 2008, the Railroad Commission of Texas
3232 held a hearing and legal examination, and J. W. "Bill" Rhea IV, who
3333 was at the time the president and chief executive officer of Gulf
3434 Energy Exploration Corp., testified on the merit and benefit of
3535 Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.'s Certificates of Compliance and
3636 Transportation Authority;
3737 (9) In a memorandum dated August 11, 2008, requested
3838 by the Railroad Commission of Texas following the hearing on June
3939 30, 2009, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. submitted a brief
4040 discussion and proposed operation of each of its orphaned wells in
4141 Sherman Field, including State Tract 708-S No. 5, and its reserve
4242 potential;
4343 (10) On September 9, 2008, the Railroad Commission of
4444 Texas approved Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.'s Certificates of
4545 Compliance and Transportation Authority and rescinded its previous
4646 plugging orders;
4747 (11) On November 10, 2008, Superior Energy Service,
4848 Inc., provided a wellbore diagram in support of the workover or
4949 recompletion procedure to be performed by Gulf Energy Exploration
5050 Corp. on State Tract 708-S No. 5;
5151 (12) Under the State of Texas Oil and Gas Lease
5252 #M-107592, the amount of royalties Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
5353 would have to pay to the State of Texas would increase if production
5454 in paying quantities was not established by February 6, 2009;
5555 (13) On December 30, 2008, Gulf Energy Exploration
5656 Corp. commenced operations on State Tract 708-S No. 5 in
5757 anticipation of completing workover operations and placing the well
5858 in production ahead of the February 6, 2009, deadline only to
5959 discover that State Tract 708-S No. 5 had been wrongfully plugged;
6060 (14) One week later, on January 9, 2009,
6161 representatives of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. and the Railroad
6262 Commission of Texas met to discuss the wrongful plugging of State
6363 Tract 708-S No. 5;
6464 (15) On January 14, 2009, representatives of Gulf
6565 Energy Exploration Corp. and the Railroad Commission of Texas met
6666 again, and the commission admitted to wrongfully plugging State
6767 Tract 708-S No. 5;
6868 (16) To date, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. has
6969 invested, spent, or committed to spend $2,810,000, in addition to
7070 the $400,000 deposit paid to the Railroad Commission of Texas, in
7171 support of workover, recompletion, pipeline, and facilities
7272 repairs to the Sherman Field area gathering system and two of its
7373 other orphaned wells;
7474 (17) Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. has calculated the
7575 known cost to unplug and drill out State Tract 708-S No. 5 to 2,000
7676 feet to be at least $1,596,650;
7777 (18) Due to the manner in which State Tract 708-S No. 5
7878 was plugged, a very real risk exists that substantial, unforeseen
7979 problems may emerge in unplugging and drilling out the well and the
8080 amount of contingency to use in calculating total costs cannot be
8181 estimated with any degree of certainty;
8282 (19) Given the degree of uncertainty in calculating
8383 the contingency, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. has used a range of
8484 15 to 50 percent of the known costs, estimating the total cost to
8585 unplug and drill out State Tract 708-S No. 5 to 2,000 feet to be
8686 anywhere from $1,836,200 to $2,395,000; however, Gulf Energy
8787 Exploration Corp. also recognizes, based on experience, that any
8888 cost overrun could exceed the amount of known costs by 100 percent
8989 or more and could result in the abandonment of the well;
9090 (20) Alternatively, Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. has
9191 received from Applied Drilling Technology, Inc., a viable, turnkey
9292 proposal to redrill the well to 3,250 feet for known costs amounting
9393 to $2,075,000 plus nominally estimated additional costs for setting
9494 and cementing production casing, mobilization and demobilization,
9595 a structural link to the existing caisson and structure, the
9696 expected use of the wellhead, tubing, packer, and supplies, and a
9797 prefabricated flowline bridge connection, which brings the
9898 estimated total cost to redrill State Tract 708-S No. 5 to 3,250
9999 feet to $2,426,000;
100100 (21) Taking advantage of a third-party, turnkey
101101 operation like Applied Drilling Technology, Inc.'s proposal
102102 transfers the risk and responsibility of unforeseen problems and
103103 expenses to the third party, making it a risk-free alternative;
104104 (22) A risk-free option does not exist for the
105105 Railroad Commission of Texas to reenter the abandoned well and
106106 return the wellbore to useable condition for Gulf Energy
107107 Exploration Corp., and a very real risk exists that the time and
108108 money spent attempting a reentry would very likely exceed the cost
109109 of a turnkey operation;
110110 (23) Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. respectfully
111111 requests that the Railroad Commission of Texas provide the funds
112112 necessary to proceed with a risk-free alternative like the proposal
113113 submitted by Applied Drilling Technology, Inc.;
114114 (24) Gulf Energy Exploration Corp. also requests a
115115 timely response from the Railroad Commission of Texas in providing
116116 these funds considering the corporation's lost opportunity in the
117117 well due to the wrongful plugging of State Tract 708-S No. 5; now,
118118 therefore, be it
119119 RESOLVED by the Legislature of the State of Texas, That Gulf
120120 Energy Exploration Corp. is granted permission to sue the State of
121121 Texas and the Railroad Commission of Texas subject to Chapter 107,
122122 Civil Practice and Remedies Code; and, be it further
123123 RESOLVED, That the total of all damages awarded in the suit
124124 authorized by this resolution, including any court costs,
125125 attorney's fees, and prejudgment interest awarded under the law,
126126 may not exceed $2,500,000, and that Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
127127 may not plead an amount in excess of that amount in any suit
128128 authorized by this resolution; and, be it further
129129 RESOLVED, That the chairman of the Railroad Commission of
130130 Texas and the attorney general be served process as provided by
131131 Subdivision (3), Subsection (a), Section 107.002, Civil Practice
132132 and Remedies Code.
133133 ______________________________ ______________________________
134134 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
135135 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 72 was adopted by the Senate
136136 on May 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6.
137137 ______________________________
138138 Secretary of the Senate
139139 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 72 was adopted by the House
140140 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 43, one
141141 present not voting.
142142 ______________________________
143143 Chief Clerk of the House
144144 Approved:
145145 ______________________________
146146 Date
147147 ______________________________
148148 Governor