E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5152 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5155 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 5137 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#1743 | Journal Page: 6961 |
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6961 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6961 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 5162 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 5123 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |