E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 05/25/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3166 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4321 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4321 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4351 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2732 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 2732 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2731 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |