E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4133 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5177 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5177 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4569 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Printed in full | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Read | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |