Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR82 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    2009S1491-1 05/31/09
 By: Gallegos S.C.R. No. 82


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, House Bill No. 4445 has been adopted by the house of
 representatives and the senate and is being prepared for
 enrollment; and
 WHEREAS, The bill contains technical errors that should be
 corrected; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 the enrolling clerk of the house be instructed to make the following
 corrections:
 (1) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
 "December 1, 2009" and substitute "December 1, 2011".
 (2) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
 "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011".
 (3) In Subsection (b), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
 "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011".
 (4) In Subsection (c), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
 "January 1, 2010" and substitute "January 1, 2012".
 (5) In SECTION 5 of the bill, strike "September 1, 2009" and
 substitute "September 1, 2011".