S.C.R. No. 82 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, House Bill No. 4445 has been adopted by the house of representatives and the senate and is being prepared for enrollment; and WHEREAS, The bill contains technical errors that should be corrected; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED by the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, That the enrolling clerk of the house be instructed to make the following corrections: (1) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike "December 1, 2009" and substitute "December 1, 2011". (2) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011". (3) In Subsection (b), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011". (4) In Subsection (c), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike "January 1, 2010" and substitute "January 1, 2012". (5) In SECTION 5 of the bill, strike "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011". ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 82 was adopted by the Senate on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 82 was adopted by the House on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor