Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR82 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.C.R. No. 82
22
33
44 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
55 WHEREAS, House Bill No. 4445 has been adopted by the house of
66 representatives and the senate and is being prepared for
77 enrollment; and
88 WHEREAS, The bill contains technical errors that should be
99 corrected; now, therefore, be it
1010 RESOLVED by the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, That
1111 the enrolling clerk of the house be instructed to make the following
1212 corrections:
1313 (1) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
1414 "December 1, 2009" and substitute "December 1, 2011".
1515 (2) In Subsection (a), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
1616 "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011".
1717 (3) In Subsection (b), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
1818 "September 1, 2009" and substitute "September 1, 2011".
1919 (4) In Subsection (c), SECTION 4 of the bill, strike
2020 "January 1, 2010" and substitute "January 1, 2012".
2121 (5) In SECTION 5 of the bill, strike "September 1, 2009" and
2222 substitute "September 1, 2011".
2323 ______________________________ ______________________________
2424 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
2525 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 82 was adopted by the Senate
2626 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
2727 ______________________________
2828 Secretary of the Senate
2929 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 82 was adopted by the House
3030 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, one
3131 present not voting.
3232 ______________________________
3333 Chief Clerk of the House
3434 Approved:
3535 ______________________________
3636 Date
3737 ______________________________
3838 Governor