E | 03/02/2009 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 363 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 306 | |
House | 02/03/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 124 | |
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |