House
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2296
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1870
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1074
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|