House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1568 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |