Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR52 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis S.J.R. No. 52
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1;
 April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 52 By: Davis


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 by general law to permit counties to assess and collect a local
 motor fuels tax and an additional vehicle registration fee to be
 used for mobility improvement projects.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a) The legislature by general law may authorize
 a county to:
 (1)  assess and collect a local tax on the sale of
 gasoline and diesel fuel in the county;
 (2)  assess and collect an additional vehicle
 registration fee on a vehicle registered in the county; and
 (3)  use all revenue derived from the tax and fee for
 mobility improvement projects, including acquiring rights-of-way,
 constructing and maintaining public roadways of the county, and
 providing funding for the construction, maintenance, and operation
 of passenger rail, transit, and freight rail systems.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 constitution, revenue derived from a tax or fee authorized by
 Subsection (a) of this section may only be used as provided by that
 subsection.
 (c)  Section 7-a of this article does not apply to a tax
 authorized by this section.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature by general law to permit counties to assess and collect
 a local motor fuels tax and an additional vehicle registration fee
 to be used for mobility improvement projects."
 * * * * *