House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1145
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1074
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|