1 | 1 | | By: Carona, et al. S.J.R. No. 9 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for |
---|
6 | 6 | | which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on |
---|
7 | 7 | | motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received from the |
---|
8 | 8 | | federal government may be used. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, Texas |
---|
11 | 11 | | Constitution, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 7-a. (a) Subject to legislative appropriation, |
---|
13 | 13 | | allocation, and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment |
---|
14 | 14 | | of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived |
---|
15 | 15 | | from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross |
---|
16 | 16 | | production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used |
---|
17 | 17 | | to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used only |
---|
18 | 18 | | for [the sole purpose of] acquiring rights-of-way and[,] |
---|
19 | 19 | | constructing and[,] maintaining[, and policing] such public |
---|
20 | 20 | | roadways, and for the administration of such laws as may be |
---|
21 | 21 | | prescribed by the Legislature pertaining to the supervision of |
---|
22 | 22 | | traffic and safety on such roads performed by, or under the |
---|
23 | 23 | | supervision of, the agency of this state, or a component or |
---|
24 | 24 | | successor in function, responsible for the construction and |
---|
25 | 25 | | maintenance of state highways; [and for the payment of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | principal and interest on county and road district bonds or |
---|
27 | 27 | | warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939, and declared |
---|
28 | 28 | | eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of the County and |
---|
29 | 29 | | Road District Highway Fund under existing law;] provided, however, |
---|
30 | 30 | | that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from the motor fuel tax |
---|
31 | 31 | | shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; and, provided, |
---|
32 | 32 | | however, that the net revenue derived by counties from motor |
---|
33 | 33 | | vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the maximum |
---|
34 | 34 | | amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the percentage |
---|
35 | 35 | | allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in effect on |
---|
36 | 36 | | January 1, 1945. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) Nothing in this section may [contained herein shall] be |
---|
38 | 38 | | construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any |
---|
39 | 39 | | purpose. |
---|
40 | 40 | | Sec. 7-b. All revenues received from the federal government |
---|
41 | 41 | | as reimbursement for state expenditures of funds that are |
---|
42 | 42 | | themselves dedicated for acquiring rights-of-way and constructing |
---|
43 | 43 | | and[,] maintaining[, and policing] public roadways or for the |
---|
44 | 44 | | administration of a law described by Section 7-a of this article are |
---|
45 | 45 | | also constitutionally dedicated and shall be used only for those |
---|
46 | 46 | | purposes. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
48 | 48 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
49 | 49 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
50 | 50 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature, |
---|
51 | 51 | | Regular Session, 2009, prescribing the purposes for which revenue |
---|
52 | 52 | | from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and |
---|
53 | 53 | | lubricants and certain revenues received from the federal |
---|
54 | 54 | | government may be used. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (b) The amendments to Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of |
---|
56 | 56 | | this constitution, take effect September 1, 2018. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (c) Beginning in the state fiscal year beginning on |
---|
58 | 58 | | September 1, 2018, and subject to Subsection (e) of this temporary |
---|
59 | 59 | | provision, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue |
---|
60 | 60 | | described by Section 7-a or 7-b, Article VIII, of this |
---|
61 | 61 | | constitution, and the state agency responsible for the construction |
---|
62 | 62 | | and maintenance of state highways may not allocate any revenue |
---|
63 | 63 | | described by those sections that is appropriated to the state |
---|
64 | 64 | | agency, for any purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way and |
---|
65 | 65 | | constructing and maintaining public roadways or for the |
---|
66 | 66 | | administration of a law described by Section 7-a, Article VIII, of |
---|
67 | 67 | | this constitution. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (d) Beginning in each state fiscal year that begins on or |
---|
69 | 69 | | after September 1, 2011, but before September 1, 2018, and subject |
---|
70 | 70 | | to Subsection (e) of this temporary provision, the legislature |
---|
71 | 71 | | shall proportionally decrease the amount of revenue described by |
---|
72 | 72 | | Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of this constitution, that is |
---|
73 | 73 | | appropriated for any purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way and |
---|
74 | 74 | | constructing and maintaining public roadways or for the |
---|
75 | 75 | | administration of a law described by Section 7-a of that article, as |
---|
76 | 76 | | necessary to comply with Subsection (c) of this temporary provision |
---|
77 | 77 | | beginning September 1, 2018. The state agency responsible for the |
---|
78 | 78 | | construction and maintenance of state highways shall ensure that |
---|
79 | 79 | | any revenue described by Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of this |
---|
80 | 80 | | constitution, that is appropriated to the agency is allocated in a |
---|
81 | 81 | | manner that reflects that proportional decrease. |
---|
82 | 82 | | (e) This temporary provision does not affect: |
---|
83 | 83 | | (1) the allocation of revenue to the available school |
---|
84 | 84 | | fund or the allocation to counties of motor vehicle registration |
---|
85 | 85 | | fees under Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this constitution; or |
---|
86 | 86 | | (2) the use of revenue described by Sections 7-a and |
---|
87 | 87 | | 7-b, Article VIII, of this constitution, for a purpose specifically |
---|
88 | 88 | | authorized by another provision of this constitution. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (f) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2019. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
91 | 91 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009. |
---|
92 | 92 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
93 | 93 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment prescribing the |
---|
94 | 94 | | purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and |
---|
95 | 95 | | taxes on motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received |
---|
96 | 96 | | from the federal government may be used." |
---|