Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR9 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.J.R. No. 9
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 9 By: Carona


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for
 which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on
 motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received from the
 federal government may be used.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a. (a) Subject to legislative appropriation,
 allocation, and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used only
 for [the sole purpose of] acquiring rights-of-way and[,]
 constructing and[,] maintaining[, and policing] such public
 roadways, and for the administration of such laws as may be
 prescribed by the Legislature pertaining to the supervision of
 traffic and safety on such roads performed by, or under the
 supervision of, the agency of this state, or a component or
 successor in function, responsible for the construction and
 maintenance of state highways; [and for the payment of the
 principal and interest on county and road district bonds or
 warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939, and declared
 eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of the County and
 Road District Highway Fund under existing law;] provided, however,
 that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from the motor fuel tax
 shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; and, provided,
 however, that the net revenue derived by counties from motor
 vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the maximum
 amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the percentage
 allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in effect on
 January 1, 1945.
 (b) Nothing in this section may [contained herein shall] be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 Sec. 7-b. All revenues received from the federal government
 as reimbursement for state expenditures of funds that are
 themselves dedicated for acquiring rights-of-way and constructing
 and[,] maintaining[, and policing] public roadways or for the
 administration of a law described by Section 7-a of this article are
 also constitutionally dedicated and shall be used only for those
 purposes.
 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, prescribing the purposes for which revenue
 from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and
 lubricants and certain revenues received from the federal
 government may be used.
 (b)  The amendments to Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of
 this constitution, take effect September 1, 2018.
 (c)  Beginning in the state fiscal year beginning on
 September 1, 2018, and subject to Subsection (e) of this temporary
 provision, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue
 described by Section 7-a or 7-b, Article VIII, of this
 constitution, and the state agency responsible for the construction
 and maintenance of state highways may not allocate any revenue
 described by those sections that is appropriated to the state
 agency, for any purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way and
 constructing and maintaining public roadways or for the
 administration of a law described by Section 7-a, Article VIII, of
 this constitution.
 (d)  Beginning in each state fiscal year that begins on or
 after September 1, 2011, but before September 1, 2018, and subject
 to Subsection (e) of this temporary provision, the legislature
 shall proportionally decrease the amount of revenue described by
 Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of this constitution, that is
 appropriated for any purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way and
 constructing and maintaining public roadways or for the
 administration of a law described by Section 7-a of that article, as
 necessary to comply with Subsection (c) of this temporary provision
 beginning September 1, 2018. The state agency responsible for the
 construction and maintenance of state highways shall ensure that
 any revenue described by Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of this
 constitution, that is appropriated to the agency is allocated in a
 manner that reflects that proportional decrease.
 (e) This temporary provision does not affect:
 (1)  the allocation of revenue to the available school
 fund or the allocation to counties of motor vehicle registration
 fees under Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this constitution; or
 (2)  the use of revenue described by Sections 7-a and
 7-b, Article VIII, of this constitution, for a purpose specifically
 authorized by another provision of this constitution.
 (f) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prescribing the
 purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and
 taxes on motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received
 from the federal government may be used."
 * * * * *