1 | 1 | | SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 1035 |
---|
2 | 2 | | In Memory |
---|
3 | 3 | | of |
---|
4 | 4 | | Adrian Clare Wolfe |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the |
---|
6 | 6 | | citizens of Brownsville in mourning the loss of Sister Adrian |
---|
7 | 7 | | Clare Wolfe, who died April 23, 2009, at the age of 78; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, A Sister of the Incarnate Word and Blessed |
---|
9 | 9 | | Sacrament, Adrian Clare Wolfe was born June 3, 1930, in New |
---|
10 | 10 | | Orleans; she graduated from Incarnate Word Academy in Corpus |
---|
11 | 11 | | Christi and entered Incarnate Word Convent in 1948; she made her |
---|
12 | 12 | | first profession of vows on April 15, 1950, and professed |
---|
13 | 13 | | perpetual vows April 18, 1953; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare earned a bachelor's degree |
---|
15 | 15 | | from Incarnate Word College in San Antonio and a master's degree |
---|
16 | 16 | | from Saint Louis University in Missouri; she also received a |
---|
17 | 17 | | Catholic Choirmasters Certificate from the Gregorian Institute |
---|
18 | 18 | | of America; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare devoted her career to |
---|
20 | 20 | | education; in Corpus Christi she taught and served as principal |
---|
21 | 21 | | at Saint Patrick School; she also taught at Incarnate Word |
---|
22 | 22 | | Academy and Christopher College and she served as representative |
---|
23 | 23 | | to the Pastoral Commission for the Diocese of Corpus Christi; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | WHEREAS, In the Diocese of Brownsville, Sister Adrian |
---|
25 | 25 | | Clare taught and served as the principal at Villa Maria High |
---|
26 | 26 | | School; following her retirement, she continued to take an active |
---|
27 | 27 | | part in education, helping seminarians and priests with language |
---|
28 | 28 | | tutoring in preparation for liturgies and homilies; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare played an important role in |
---|
30 | 30 | | the activities of the Brownsville Diocese, serving as Advocate |
---|
31 | 31 | | and Director of the Marriage Tribunal, Vicar for Religious, and |
---|
32 | 32 | | president of the Council of Religious; she also chaired Region 12 |
---|
33 | 33 | | of the National Sisters Vocation Conference and was commissioned |
---|
34 | 34 | | as Extraordinary Minister of the Eucharist; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | WHEREAS, A woman of courage, compassion, and enduring |
---|
36 | 36 | | faith, Sister Adrian Clare gave unselfishly to others, and her |
---|
37 | 37 | | dedication, grace, and generous spirit will not be forgotten by |
---|
38 | 38 | | those who were privileged to share in her life; now, therefore, |
---|
39 | 39 | | be it |
---|
40 | 40 | | RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st |
---|
41 | 41 | | Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved |
---|
42 | 42 | | family of Adrian Clare Wolfe; and, be it further |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for |
---|
44 | 44 | | her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas |
---|
45 | 45 | | Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in |
---|
46 | 46 | | memory of Sister Adrian Clare Wolfe. |
---|
47 | 47 | | Lucio |
---|
48 | 48 | | ________________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | President of the Senate |
---|
50 | 50 | | I hereby certify that the |
---|
51 | 51 | | above Resolution was adopted by |
---|
52 | 52 | | the Senate on May 28, 2009, by a |
---|
53 | 53 | | rising vote. |
---|
54 | 54 | | ________________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | 56 | | ________________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Member, Texas Senate |
---|