Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR1035 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 1035
 In Memory
 of
 Adrian Clare Wolfe
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Brownsville in mourning the loss of Sister Adrian
 Clare Wolfe, who died April 23, 2009, at the age of 78; and
 WHEREAS, A Sister of the Incarnate Word and Blessed
 Sacrament, Adrian Clare Wolfe was born June 3, 1930, in New
 Orleans; she graduated from Incarnate Word Academy in Corpus
 Christi and entered Incarnate Word Convent in 1948; she made her
 first profession of vows on April 15, 1950, and professed
 perpetual vows April 18, 1953; and
 WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare earned a bachelor's degree
 from Incarnate Word College in San Antonio and a master's degree
 from Saint Louis University in Missouri; she also received a
 Catholic Choirmasters Certificate from the Gregorian Institute
 of America; and
 WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare devoted her career to
 education; in Corpus Christi she taught and served as principal
 at Saint Patrick School; she also taught at Incarnate Word
 Academy and Christopher College and she served as representative
 to the Pastoral Commission for the Diocese of Corpus Christi; and
 WHEREAS, In the Diocese of Brownsville, Sister Adrian
 Clare taught and served as the principal at Villa Maria High
 School; following her retirement, she continued to take an active
 part in education, helping seminarians and priests with language
 tutoring in preparation for liturgies and homilies; and
 WHEREAS, Sister Adrian Clare played an important role in
 the activities of the Brownsville Diocese, serving as Advocate
 and Director of the Marriage Tribunal, Vicar for Religious, and
 president of the Council of Religious; she also chaired Region 12
 of the National Sisters Vocation Conference and was commissioned
 as Extraordinary Minister of the Eucharist; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of courage, compassion, and enduring
 faith, Sister Adrian Clare gave unselfishly to others, and her
 dedication, grace, and generous spirit will not be forgotten by
 those who were privileged to share in her life; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Adrian Clare Wolfe; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Sister Adrian Clare Wolfe.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 28, 2009, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate