SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 1049 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to recognize the members of the Williams-Livingston family on the grand occasion of their family reunion, which is being held June 5 through 7, 2009; and WHEREAS, Every year, on the first Saturday of June, members of the Williams-Livingston family hold a reunion to celebrate their heritage and to commemorate the birth of Mamie Elizabeth "Mama Mae" Williams; they invite friends from across Texas and the United States and descendants of other branches of the family to share their celebration of love for their family and community; and WHEREAS, The reunion features a family talent show, an old-fashioned fish fry, and a recital of the family's history; the Mamie E. Williams Humanitarian Award is given to one family member for unselfish service to the family, and recognition is given for graduations, academic and athletic accomplishments, marriages, anniversaries, and births; family members who have died since the last reunion are recognized and remembered with a moment of silence; and WHEREAS, Each year, a new set of family members takes the helm on duties and responsibilities of preparing for and coordinating the reunion and passing on the family history; and WHEREAS, Family history reveals that the Charles and Caroline Livingston families arrived in the Freestone County area in the early 1800s; and WHEREAS, Charles Livingston's family moved from Virginia as freed slaves and settled in the Freestone County area known as Cotton Gin and sharecropped on local farms; and WHEREAS, Caroline Livingston's family moved from Alabama to Kirvin in Freestone County; they arrived in covered wagons, on horseback, and on foot; they settled on the Alfred Carter farm and worked his land; and WHEREAS, Caroline and Charles Livingston's children, Elbert Jefferson, Fannie, Foster, Elizabeth, and Callie, supported their community and were instrumental in establishing the Woods Chapel Primitive Baptist Church; they also helped create a public school system; and WHEREAS, The members of the Williams-Livingston family who host the annual reunion are the descendants of Caroline and Charles Livingston's daughter Elizabeth Livingston; born July 2, 1866, she married Austin Williams, a freed slave from Tennessee, and the couple had 10 children; Mamie Elizabeth "Mama Mae" Williams, born June 1, 1889, was one of those children; and WHEREAS, Mamie Elizabeth "Mama Mae" Williams was the matriarch of the Williams-Livingston family until October 13, 1987, when she died at the age of 98; her daughters and their families had scattered across Texas to Dallas, Fort Worth, Houston, and San Antonio, where many of the Williams-Livingston family members reside and work today; and WHEREAS, The Williams-Livingston family members are successful men and women who have contributed greatly to their communities through their leadership, professionalism, and concern for others; and WHEREAS, They are exemplary citizens who believe strongly in traditional values and instill in their children the virtues of love and hard work; and WHEREAS, The annual Williams-Livingston reunion is the manifestation of the family's belief in unity, loyalty, and pride in one's heritage; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st Legislature, hereby extend to the members of the Williams-Livingston family best wishes for a joyous and memorable family reunion and proclaim June 6, 2009, Williams-Livingston Day in Texas; and, be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for the family as a memento of this special occasion. West ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on May 27, 2009. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate