Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR215

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  

Caption

Recognizing February 17, 2009, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution not only celebrates San Antonio's historical significance but also emphasizes its modern-day importance as an economic hub in Texas. The city has seen remarkable growth, welcoming important businesses and industries due to its skilled workforce and educational institutions. By formally recognizing this day, the bill aims to bolster pride among residents and foster a deeper appreciation for San Antonio's cultural contributions towards the state.

Summary

Senate Resolution 215 recognizes February 17, 2009, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol. The resolution highlights the importance of San Antonio's history, including its origins dating back to 1691 with Spanish explorers. It celebrates the city's rich heritage, including significant locations like the Alamo, which played a pivotal role in Texas history. The acknowledgment of this date serves to honor the city's contributions to the state's cultural landscape and invites a visiting delegation from San Antonio to the Capitol.

Contention

While Senate Resolution 215 may appear largely ceremonial, it reflects broader themes of regional pride and identity. There may be discussions regarding the visibility of smaller cities and communities within the legislative framework. Recognizing such days could be seen as a way to promote local interests and tourism, which sometimes face challenges in larger state policy discussions aiming for statewide priorities.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX SR220

Recognizing February 24, 2015, as Viva San Antonio Day.

TX SR17

Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR66

Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR249

Recognizing February 21, 2013, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR471

Recognizing February 21, 2013, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR617

Recognizing February 24, 2015, as VIVA San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR319

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as VIVA San Antonio Day.

TX HR607

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as VIVA San Antonio Day.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.