Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR228 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 228
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to pay
 tribute to the Most Reverend Raymundo J. Pea, Bishop of the
 Diocese of Brownsville, on the grand occasion of his 75th
 birthday; and
 WHEREAS, Well known for his warmth and generosity of
 spirit, this distinguished clergyman has devoted his time and
 energy unselfishly to the people of his diocese since 1995; and
 WHEREAS, Bishop Pea was born February 19, 1934; he was
 ordained to the priesthood on May 25, 1957, in Corpus Christi,
 and he has served his church with wisdom and humility in various
 positions through the years, including auxiliary bishop of the
 Archdiocese of San Antonio and bishop of the Diocese of El Paso;
 and
 WHEREAS, In May, 1995, Pope John Paul II asked Bishop Pea
 to move to the Diocese of Brownsville, containing one of the
 largest and fastest-growing Catholic populations in the United
 States; on August 7, 1995, Bishop Raymundo J. Pea was installed
 as the fifth bishop of Brownsville; and
 WHEREAS, An accomplished scholar and theologian, he has
 ministered faithfully to the temporal and spiritual needs of
 innumerable people; and
 WHEREAS, Bishop Pea is a beloved and respected member of
 his community, and he is noted for his courage, his compassion,
 and his enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby recognize the Most Reverend Raymundo J.
 Pea, Bishop of the Diocese of Brownsville, as a treasured
 citizen of our state and extend to him best wishes for a joyful
 75th birthday; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 him as an expression of high regard from the Texas Senate.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 17, 2009.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate