Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR395 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 395
 In Memory
 of
 David Richard Frank
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of David Richard Frank on March 18, 2009,
 the day that would have been the 49th anniversary of his marriage
 to Emily Birdwell Frank; and
 WHEREAS, David Frank was born August 8, 1939, near Mentz in
 Colorado County; he graduated from Columbus High School in 1957,
 and shortly thereafter, he moved to Houston and joined the Army
 National Guard, in which he served faithfully for many years
 until he was honorably discharged in 1990; and
 WHEREAS, He met the love of his life, Emily Birdwell, while
 skating at a rink in Eagle Lake; David and Emily married on March
 18, 1960, at Saint Paul Lutheran Church in Columbus, and the
 couple moved to Columbus that summer; their daughter, Julie
 Ellen, was born on December 15, 1974; and
 WHEREAS, A leader in the Columbus community, David served
 for a number of years as a director of the Colorado County Fair
 Association and was a member of the Columbus Lions Club and the
 Bernardo Hermann Sons Lodge 243; he was a member of the Columbus
 Volunteer Fire Department from 1977 to 1995; he retired from his
 work with the Texas Department of Transportation on December 31,
 1994; and
 WHEREAS, David and Emily were exemplary Columbus citizens
 and shared a deep love and devotion to one another throughout the
 years of their marriage; until his death on November 13, 2007,
 David lived a fulfilling life with Emily, and their happiness
 together was an inspiration to others; and
 WHEREAS, David enjoyed hunting in the Texas Hill Country
 around Junction and looked forward to annual hunting trips in
 Colorado; he was close to his friends in the guard and at the fire
 department, and the members of the Columbus Volunteer Fire
 Department Honor Guard served as pallbearers at his funeral; and
 WHEREAS, David was a man of integrity, strength, and
 generosity; a dedicated husband and father, he was beloved by his
 family and friends, and he left behind memories that are deeply
 treasured by all who were privileged to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of David Richard
 Frank and to the long and rewarding marriage that he and Emily
 devotedly shared; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 Emily Frank, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so
 in memory of David Frank.
 West
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 9, 2009, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate