SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 395 In Memory of David Richard Frank WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and commemorates the life of David Richard Frank on March 18, 2009, the day that would have been the 49th anniversary of his marriage to Emily Birdwell Frank; and WHEREAS, David Frank was born August 8, 1939, near Mentz in Colorado County; he graduated from Columbus High School in 1957, and shortly thereafter, he moved to Houston and joined the Army National Guard, in which he served faithfully for many years until he was honorably discharged in 1990; and WHEREAS, He met the love of his life, Emily Birdwell, while skating at a rink in Eagle Lake; David and Emily married on March 18, 1960, at Saint Paul Lutheran Church in Columbus, and the couple moved to Columbus that summer; their daughter, Julie Ellen, was born on December 15, 1974; and WHEREAS, A leader in the Columbus community, David served for a number of years as a director of the Colorado County Fair Association and was a member of the Columbus Lions Club and the Bernardo Hermann Sons Lodge 243; he was a member of the Columbus Volunteer Fire Department from 1977 to 1995; he retired from his work with the Texas Department of Transportation on December 31, 1994; and WHEREAS, David and Emily were exemplary Columbus citizens and shared a deep love and devotion to one another throughout the years of their marriage; until his death on November 13, 2007, David lived a fulfilling life with Emily, and their happiness together was an inspiration to others; and WHEREAS, David enjoyed hunting in the Texas Hill Country around Junction and looked forward to annual hunting trips in Colorado; he was close to his friends in the guard and at the fire department, and the members of the Columbus Volunteer Fire Department Honor Guard served as pallbearers at his funeral; and WHEREAS, David was a man of integrity, strength, and generosity; a dedicated husband and father, he was beloved by his family and friends, and he left behind memories that are deeply treasured by all who were privileged to share in his life; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of David Richard Frank and to the long and rewarding marriage that he and Emily devotedly shared; and, be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for Emily Frank, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of David Frank. West ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on March 9, 2009, by a rising vote. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate