1 | 1 | | SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 395 |
---|
2 | 2 | | In Memory |
---|
3 | 3 | | of |
---|
4 | 4 | | David Richard Frank |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and |
---|
6 | 6 | | commemorates the life of David Richard Frank on March 18, 2009, |
---|
7 | 7 | | the day that would have been the 49th anniversary of his marriage |
---|
8 | 8 | | to Emily Birdwell Frank; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, David Frank was born August 8, 1939, near Mentz in |
---|
10 | 10 | | Colorado County; he graduated from Columbus High School in 1957, |
---|
11 | 11 | | and shortly thereafter, he moved to Houston and joined the Army |
---|
12 | 12 | | National Guard, in which he served faithfully for many years |
---|
13 | 13 | | until he was honorably discharged in 1990; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | WHEREAS, He met the love of his life, Emily Birdwell, while |
---|
15 | 15 | | skating at a rink in Eagle Lake; David and Emily married on March |
---|
16 | 16 | | 18, 1960, at Saint Paul Lutheran Church in Columbus, and the |
---|
17 | 17 | | couple moved to Columbus that summer; their daughter, Julie |
---|
18 | 18 | | Ellen, was born on December 15, 1974; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, A leader in the Columbus community, David served |
---|
20 | 20 | | for a number of years as a director of the Colorado County Fair |
---|
21 | 21 | | Association and was a member of the Columbus Lions Club and the |
---|
22 | 22 | | Bernardo Hermann Sons Lodge 243; he was a member of the Columbus |
---|
23 | 23 | | Volunteer Fire Department from 1977 to 1995; he retired from his |
---|
24 | 24 | | work with the Texas Department of Transportation on December 31, |
---|
25 | 25 | | 1994; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, David and Emily were exemplary Columbus citizens |
---|
27 | 27 | | and shared a deep love and devotion to one another throughout the |
---|
28 | 28 | | years of their marriage; until his death on November 13, 2007, |
---|
29 | 29 | | David lived a fulfilling life with Emily, and their happiness |
---|
30 | 30 | | together was an inspiration to others; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, David enjoyed hunting in the Texas Hill Country |
---|
32 | 32 | | around Junction and looked forward to annual hunting trips in |
---|
33 | 33 | | Colorado; he was close to his friends in the guard and at the fire |
---|
34 | 34 | | department, and the members of the Columbus Volunteer Fire |
---|
35 | 35 | | Department Honor Guard served as pallbearers at his funeral; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, David was a man of integrity, strength, and |
---|
37 | 37 | | generosity; a dedicated husband and father, he was beloved by his |
---|
38 | 38 | | family and friends, and he left behind memories that are deeply |
---|
39 | 39 | | treasured by all who were privileged to share in his life; now, |
---|
40 | 40 | | therefore, be it |
---|
41 | 41 | | RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st |
---|
42 | 42 | | Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of David Richard |
---|
43 | 43 | | Frank and to the long and rewarding marriage that he and Emily |
---|
44 | 44 | | devotedly shared; and, be it further |
---|
45 | 45 | | RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for |
---|
46 | 46 | | Emily Frank, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so |
---|
47 | 47 | | in memory of David Frank. |
---|
48 | 48 | | West |
---|
49 | 49 | | ________________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | President of the Senate |
---|
51 | 51 | | I hereby certify that the |
---|
52 | 52 | | above Resolution was adopted by |
---|
53 | 53 | | the Senate on March 9, 2009, by a |
---|
54 | 54 | | rising vote. |
---|
55 | 55 | | ________________________________ |
---|
56 | 56 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
57 | 57 | | ________________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Member, Texas Senate |
---|