Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate 2009 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Introduced
2/17/09  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 18, 2009, and ending on Monday, February 23, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Introduced
2/18/09  
Urging the Texas congressional delegation to take action to prohibit the use of federal funds to transfer enemy combatants detained at Guantanamo Bay to any facility in Texas or to build or modify facilities for any such enemy combatants in the state.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Introduced
2/18/09  
Refer
3/13/09  
Report Pass
3/30/09  
Refer
4/16/09  
Report Pass
4/29/09  
Enrolled
5/25/09  
Urging Congress to reopen consideration of the case to posthumously award the Medal of Honor to World War I hero Marcelino Serna.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Introduced
2/18/09  
Designating February 24, 2009, as Texas Transit Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Designating May 12, 2009, as Mary Kay Ash Day in the State of Texas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Introduced
2/19/09  
Recognizing Linda Muhl on the occasion of her retirement from Dr. John D. Horn High School in Mesquite.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26

Introduced
2/19/09  
Enrolled
2/25/09  
Recognizing Ipswich, Queensland, Australia, on the occasion of the 40th Anniversary Memorial Service in honor of the crew of the USS Frank E. Evans.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR27

Introduced
2/19/09  
Enrolled
2/25/09  
Recognizing February 26, 2009, as TIPRO Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
3/9/09  
Enrolled
3/20/09  
Recognizing William F. Mullican III on the occasion of his retirement from the Texas Water Development Board.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR29

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/9/09  
In memory of Patrick Honeycutt of Austin.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3

Introduced
1/14/09  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 14, 2009, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR30

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/10/09  
In memory of Jess M. Irwin, Jr.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR31

Introduced
2/23/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/9/09  
Recognizing Bell Helicopter Textron on the occasion of the 10th anniversary of its Amarillo Military Aircraft Assembly Center.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32

Introduced
2/24/09  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 25, 2009, and ending on Monday, March 2, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR33

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
3/13/09  
Granting Betty Bardwell permission to sue the State of Texas, The University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston, and the Office of the Attorney General.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records