Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1295
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
House
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|