Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1053 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 1053
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 23, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the tuition exemption offered by public institutions of
 higher education to firefighters enrolled in certain courses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.2082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.2082.  FIRE SCIENCE TUITION EXEMPTION ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE. (a)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall establish an advisory committee to develop recommendations
 for the implementation of the tuition exemption for students
 enrolled in courses offered as part of a fire science curriculum
 offered under Section 54.208, as amended by Chapters 1285 (H.B.
 2013) and 1299 (H.B. 2347), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, including a determination of the definition and
 scope of fire science curriculum.
 (b)  The advisory committee must be composed of members from
 institutions of higher education, experts in the fire sciences, and
 firefighters.
 (c)  The advisory committee may request the cooperation and
 assistance of state agencies in preparing recommendations under
 this section.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2012, the advisory committee
 shall issue a report of its recommendations to the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house, each standing committee of the
 legislature with jurisdiction over higher education, and the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *