Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1135 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1135
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an application to run for political office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.032, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  After the filing deadline:
 (1)  a candidate may not amend an application filed
 under Section 141.031; and
 (2)  the authority with whom the application is filed
 may not accept an amendment to an application filed under Section
 141.031.
 SECTION 2.  Section 141.062, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  After the filing deadline:
 (1)  a candidate may not amend a petition in lieu of a
 filing fee submitted with the candidate's application; and
 (2)  the authority with whom the application is filed
 may not accept an amendment to a petition in lieu of a filing fee
 submitted with the candidate's application.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a candidate's application for a place on the ballot that is filed
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *